Alfonsi, Jeffrey Earnest (CPSO#: 98180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room B9-122
London ON  N6G 2V4
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: 519-663-3614
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey E Alfonsi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Alfonsi ( CPSO# 98180 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Room B9-122
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3881

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY EARNEST ALFONSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALFONSI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016