Alhasan, Abdulaziz Ayyadh M (CPSO#: 104853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
386 Yonge St
Apt 2709
Toronto ON  M5B0A5
Phone: 6479868410
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULAZIZ AYYADH M ALHASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHASAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2015