Ali, Abdulhafid Omar (CPSO#: 54666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201 East Tower
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone: (905) 404-9055
Fax: (905) 448-9988
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdulhafid Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ali ( CPSO# 54666 )

Business Address:
1615 Dundas Street East
201 East Tower
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 404-9055

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1998
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 08 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 8, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Abdulhafid Omar Ali,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ali to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:



                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ABDULHAFID OMAR ALI
                                          ("Dr. Ali")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Ali, certificate of registration number 54666, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the College conducted a re-assessment of my
                  orthopedic surgery practice (the "Re-assessment").


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.


            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for four (4) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, for an initial meeting to discuss
                              practice improvements and once every two months thereafter ;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every two
                              months, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report(s) of the medical
                        assessor, dated January 10, 2017, and concerns that may arise
                        during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20)
                        days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in
                        the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable
                        to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                        within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as
                        a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a review course satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    management of rotator cuff injuries; and
                  
                              2.    management of ACL injuries and knee arthritis 
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to
                        the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        months of the date of this undertaking.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (3) above
                        and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss with
                        the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which
                        to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Ali, hereby consent to the following being included on the
                        public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                  (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR Committee has
                        identified in its decision referenced in section (8)(d) as terms,
                        conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ali, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A re-assessment of Dr. Ali's orthopedic surgery practice was
                              conducted by the College. As a result of the re-assessment:
                  
                                    *     Dr. Ali will practise under the guidance of a
                                          Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for
                                          4 months. 
                                    *     Dr. Ali's practice will be reassessed by an
                                          assessor selected by the College within 6 months
                                          of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Ali, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Ali, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Ali, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Abdulhafid Omar Ali to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective September 8, 2017:

A re-assessment of Dr. Ali’s orthopedic surgery practice was conducted by the College. As a result of the re-assessment:

- Dr. Ali will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 4 months.
- Dr. Ali’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.