Ali, Faizal Hisham (CPSO#: 59967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
476 Palmerston Boulevard
Toronto ON  M6G 2P1
Phone: (416) 588-8681
Fax: (416) 865-0480
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

393 King Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1L3
Canada
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 77460
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Faizal Ali and Dr. Susan Beaver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 59967 )
Dr. S. Beaver ( CPSO# 59325 )

Business Address:
476 Palmerston Boulevard
Toronto ON  M6G 2P1
Phone Number: (416) 588-8681

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAIZAL HISHAM ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1989