Ali, Farah (CPSO#: 93442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Lower Jarvis Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Phone: 647-827-9200
Fax: 647-827-9202
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

40 Old Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1E 3J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-0828
Fax: (416) 284-5595
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Canada
Phone: (416) 646-1890
Fax: (416) 646-1892
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

589 King St. East
Unit 1
Toronto ON  M5A1M6
Canada
Phone: 416-419-4462
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farah Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 93442 )

Business Address:
589 King Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1M6
Phone Number: (416) 419-4462

Business Address:
40 Old Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1E 3J5
Phone Number: (416) 284-0828

Business Address:
10 Lower Javis Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Phone Number: (647) 827-9200

Business Address:
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Phone Number: (416) 646-1890

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARAH ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2014