Ali, Fareed Ahmad (CPSO#: 65299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone: (905) 212-9482
Fax: (905) 212-1012
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

105-2630 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K-0H2
Canada
Phone: 905-212-9482
Fax: 905-212-1012
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fareed Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 65299 )

Business Address:
3155 Harvester Road
Suite 200
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 639-1202

Business Address:
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 212-9482

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAREED AHMAD ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993