Ali, Naheed Sualeh (CPSO#: 53789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 264-0022
Fax: (905) 237-2183
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 2
300 Wellington Street East
Aurora ON  L4G 1J5
Canada
Phone: (905) 727-1843
Fax: (905) 237-2183
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 304
216 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Canada
Phone: (519) 428-1243
Fax: (519) 428-2445
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Suite101
3420 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  M4S 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 272-0165
Fax: (905) 272-4082
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAHEED SUALEH ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1986