Alidina, Zahra (CPSO#: 76545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pickering Medicenter
1450 Kingston Road Unit 6B
Pickering ON  L1V 1C1
Phone: (905) 831-8333
Fax: 905-831-8858
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1450 Kingston Rd Unit 6G
Pickering ON  L1V 1C1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z. Alidina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Alidina ( CPSO# 76545 )

Business Address:
Pickering Medicenter
Unit 6B and 6G
1450 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1C1
Phone Number: (905) 831-8333

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAHRA ALIDINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIDINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003