Alkon Mintsopoulos, Sultana (CPSO#: 87703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Macedonian, Russian

Education:Tashkent Pediatric Medical Institute, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site
Department of Paediatrics
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Sultana   Alkon  Mintsopoulos  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            paediatrics, only.