Allard, Christopher Brian (CPSO#: 90763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
460 Brant St, Unit 12
Burlington ON  L7R4B6
Phone: 905 635 8103
Fax: 905 333 1616
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Allard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Allard ( CPSO# 90763 )

Business Address:
Suite 12
460 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4B6
Phone Number: (905) 635-8103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER BRIAN ALLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2016