Allen, Larry Hugh (CPSO#: 32229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6366
Fax: 519 646 6418
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry H. Allen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Allen ( CPSO# 32229 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6366

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARRY HUGH ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Oct 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1984