Allen, Susan Jane (CPSO#: 50069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 152
759 Hyde Park Road
London
London ON  N6H 3S2
Phone: (519) 679-3330
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan J. Allen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 50069 )

Business Address:
Suite 152
759 Hyde Park Road
London ON  N6H 3S2
Phone Number: (519) 679-3330

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN JANE ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985