Almenawer, Saleh Abdulmohsen Saleh (CPSO#: 88266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2015

Expiry Date:  27 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Aug 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Neurosurgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 44629
Fax: 905-527-0059
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Neurosurgery
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saleh Almenawer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Almenawer ( CPSO# 88266 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Neurosurgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Department of Neurosurgery
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 28 Aug 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Saleh Abdulmohsen S. Almenawer may practise neurosurgery at Hamilton
                  General  Hospital, McMaster Children's Hospital and St. Joseph's Hospital
                  in Hamilton, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor
                  acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires three years from
                  the  date of issuance or when Dr. Almenawer's  eligibility  to  take  the
                  Royal  College  of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of  registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration  Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the  College  of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Almenawer's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or  attitude,  does  not
                        provide the required reports to the  College  by the due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Almenawer's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on August 28, 2015, and  will  expire  on  or
                  before August 27, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.