Alrajhi, Abdulaziz A M (CPSO#: 78161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 3354
Dept of Emergency Medicine MBC#84
King Faisal Specialist Hospital
and Research Center
Riyadh 11211
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966114647272 Ext. 31470
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alrajhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 3 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULAZIZ A M ALRAJHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALRAJHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2009