Alsalamah, Mohammad Abdullah S (CPSO#: 94984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  25 Sep 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 - 9780 Bramalea Rd N
Brampton ON  L6S 2P1
Phone: 9057912390
Fax: 9057918476
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Mohammad  Abdullah S Alsalamah may practise paediatrics and clinical
                  immunology and allergy  at 9780 Bramalea Road North in Brampton, Ontario,
                  while under supervision coordinated  by  a  supervisor  acceptable to the
                  College.

            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires three  years  from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor  notifies  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Alsalamah's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or  attitude,  does  not
                        provide the required reports  to  the College by the due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Alsalamah's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September  26,  2017, and will expire on or
                  before September 25, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.