Alves, Brenda Lee (CPSO#: 90570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: Baswick, Brenda Lee (used until: 08 Apr 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-2200
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Care Toronto
30 The Queensway, Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA LEE ALVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALVES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2011