Amann, Justin Hugo (CPSO#: 67857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London X-Ray Associates
Suite 104
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 672-5270
Fax: (519) 672-4459
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6035
Fax: (519) 646-6204
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Tillsonburg and District Memorial
Hospital
167 Rolph St, Tillsonburg
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

CKDH
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin H. Amann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Amann ( CPSO# 67857 )

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
450 Central Avenue
Suite 104
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-7900

Business Address:
190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone Number: (519) 438-8131

Business Address:
440 Boler Road
London ON  N6K 4L2
Phone Number: (519) 657-8246

Business Address:
105 - 595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone Number: (519) 913-7900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN HUGO AMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMANN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2000