Amba, Sudhir (CPSO#: 50075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone: (705) 722-5333
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 502
2065 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 2V7
Canada
Phone: (416) 743-6372
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Amba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amba ( CPSO# 50075 )

Business Address:
202 - 121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone Number: (705) 722-5333

Business Address:
502 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 743-6372

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUDHIR AMBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 15 Sep 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1987