Amimi, Myriam Nadia (CPSO#: 65064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
677 Great Northern Road
Unit #1
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 5A1
Phone: (705) 942-5151
Fax: (705) 942-7421
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amimi Bariciak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Amimi ( CPSO# 65064 )
Dr. M. Bariciak ( CPSO# 65066 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
677 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 5A1
Phone Number: (705) 942-5151

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYRIAM NADIA AMIMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993