Amin-Hussain, Fatima (CPSO#: 84235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Amin, Parsa Fatima (used until: 24 Mar 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chinguacousy and Sandalwood
Medical Centre
Unit 6
10671 Chinguacousy Road
Brampton ON  L7A 0N5
Phone: (905) 840-4343
Fax: (905) 840-4303
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal West Medical
305 Royal West Drive, Unit K
Brampton ON  L6X 5K8
Canada
Phone: 905-452-0200
Fax: 905-452-0212
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fatima Amin-Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Amin-Hussain ( CPSO# 84235 )

Business Address:
Chinguacousy & Sandalwood Medical Centre
Unit 6
10671 Chinguacousy Road
Brampton ON  L7A 0N5
Phone Number: (905) 840-4343

Business Address:
305 Royal West Drive
Unit K
Brampton ON  L6X 5K8
Phone Number: (905) 452-0200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008