Amjad, Saima (CPSO#: 81264)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
1 Glen Hawthorne Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5R 0C2
Phone: (905) 366-0505
Fax: (905) 366-0506
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saima Amjad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amjad ( CPSO# 81264 )

Business Address:
4 - 1 Glenn Hawthorne Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5R 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 366-0505

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAIMA AMJAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMJAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 16 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 17 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006