Anderson, Marion Catherine (CPSO#: 60708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lower Level
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone: (519) 787-1200
Fax: (519) 787-1803
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. C. Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Anderson ( CPSO# 60708 )

Business Address:
205 Queen Street East
Lower Level
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone Number: (519) 787-1200

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 832-2010

Business Address:
801 St. Davd Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone Number: (519) 843-2940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARION CATHERINE ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1991