Anderson, Scott Bruce (CPSO#: 63769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Scott Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Anderson ( CPSO# 63769 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 667-6538

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT BRUCE ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992