Andrews, John Ernest (CPSO#: 25989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
60 Champlain Street
North Bay ON  P1B 7M4
Phone: (705) 472-2898
Fax: (705) 472-9959
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Andrews Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Andrews ( CPSO# 25989 )

Business Address:
101 - 60 Champlain Street
North Bay ON  P1B 7M4
Phone Number: (705) 472-2898

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ERNEST ANDREWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREWS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1973