Anjema, Christopher Michael (CPSO#: 73372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
735 St Clair Street
Chatham ON  N7L 0E9
Phone: (519) 380-0008
Fax: (519) 354-9982
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 Christina St. N., Bayside Centr
Sarnia ON  N7T 7W5
Canada
Phone: (519) 336-6556
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher M. Anjema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Anjema ( CPSO# 73372 )

Business Address:
735 St Clair Street
Chatham ON  N7M 5J7
Phone Number: (519) 380-0008

Business Address:
150 Christina Street North
Bayside Centre
Sarnia ON  N7T 7W5
Phone Number: (519) 336-6556

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 18, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Christopher Michael
            Anjema in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Anjema to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                              UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                                ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                       of
                  
                                    DR. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL ANJEMA
                                                ("Dr. Anjema")
                  
                                                       to 
                  
                              COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                                (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the
                  Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Anjema, certificate of registration number 73372, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that the College has received information
                  regarding my standard of practice and that the College is conducting an
                  investigation, bearing File Number AMS430739, into the information. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking
                  in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

            (5)   I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the
                  ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matter currently being investigated is disposed of by a panel of the
                  ICR Committee or the Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (7)   I, Dr. Anjema, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (8)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Anjema, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month, unless I have not
                              performed any blepharoplasty procedure in the prior month,
                              nor assessed any patient with regard to a planned or
                              potential blepharoplasty procedure, nor provided care or an
                              assessment in follow-up to a blepharoplasty procedure;
                  
                        (ii)  Review all patient charts of those patients, whom I have seen
                              during the interval since the previous meeting, on whom I
                              have performed a blepharoplasty procedure, whom I have
                              assessed with regard to a planned or potential blepharoplasty
                              procedure, and to whom I have provided care or an assessment
                              in follow-up to a blepharoplasty procedure;
                  
                        (iii) Directly observe me performing at least one (1)
                              blepharoplasty procedure, unless I perform no blepharoplasty
                              procedures during the period of clinical supervision;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews and
                              observation(s);
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Anjema, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Anjema, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within forty
                        (40) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Anjema, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(d) and/or
                        (e) above, I will cease performing blepharoplasty procedures until
                        such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to
                        the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        performing blepharoplasty procedures as a result of section (8)(f)
                        above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my
                        Certificate of Registration and that term, condition or limitation
                        will be included on the public register.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Anjema, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (10)  I, Dr. Anjema, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and and to any other
                  activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance
                  with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,
                  at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the
                  Discipline Committee and in the event of an appeal of any Order of the
                  Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (17)  I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College has received information regarding Dr. Anjema's
                              standard of practice and is conducting an investigation into
                              the information. During the investigation and, should the
                              investigation result in allegations being referred to the
                              Discipline Committee, until any such proceedings are
                              concluded:
                  
                                    Dr. Anjema must practise, with respect to
                                    blepharoplasty procedures, under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Anjema, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (20)  I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B." 

            (21)  I, Dr. Anjema, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (22)  I, Dr. Anjema, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (23)  I, Dr. Anjema, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors
                  and Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A"; 
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking. 

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Michael Anjema to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 18, 2018:

The College has received information regarding Dr. Anjema’s standard of practice and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and, should the investigation result in allegations being referred to the Discipline Committee, until any such proceedings are concluded:

Dr. Anjema must practise, with respect to blepharoplasty procedures, under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)