Antao, Viola (CPSO#: 73758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Practice Health Centre
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6060 Ext. 1
Fax: (416) 323-6345
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Viola Antao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Antao ( CPSO# 73758 )

Business Address:
Family Practice Health Centre
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Business Address:
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone Number: (416) 978-2870

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIOLA ANTAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001