Antoniou, Andreas Vasilios (CPSO#: 82888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite C2 168
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55115
Fax: (519) 663-3161
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite B6-665
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 2V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Ext. 164219
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andreas Antoniou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Antoniou ( CPSO# 82888 )

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
Suite B6-665
London ON  N6A 2V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite C2-168
London ON  N6A 3W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREAS VASILIOS ANTONIOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTONIOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 May 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010