Antoniuk, Karen Marie (CPSO#: 66540)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
326 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2C2
Phone: (905) 648-0770
Fax: (905) 648-0777
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Antoniuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Antoniuk ( CPSO# 66540 )

Business Address:
326 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2C2
Phone Number: (905) 648-0770

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN MARIE ANTONIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTONIUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1995