Aoun, Lawrence (CPSO#: 88768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: 519-973-4411 Ext. 33319
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence Aoun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Aoun ( CPSO# 88768 )

Business Address:
Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE AOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AOUN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2012