Aoyama, Kazuyoshi (CPSO#: 94836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:Nagoya City University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 2929
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
Department of Anesthesia
190 Elizabeth St. Toronto, ON M5G
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416-340-3227
Fax: 416-340-3698
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kazuyoshi Aoyama Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Aoyama ( CPSO# 94836 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia
555 University Avenue
Room 2211, Black Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Japan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Kazuyoshi Aoyama may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anesthesia, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Aoyama holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Aoyama  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Aoyama's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Aoyama's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2016.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2023.