Appell, William Allan (CPSO#: 32452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 690-6762
Fax: (416) 690-6775
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-2626
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Kensington Screening Clinic
Suite 601
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-9511
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William A. Appell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Appell ( CPSO# 32452 )

Business Address:
202 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 690-6762

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ALLAN APPELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981