Archibald, Jason David (CPSO#: 78696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
8th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35804
Fax: (905) 521-6197
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.D. Archibald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Archibald ( CPSO# 78696 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
8th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON DAVID ARCHIBALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCHIBALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Dec 2002 to 22 Dec 2002
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2003 to 31 Mar 2003
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2007