Armstrong, Paidrig Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 69648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Services
Association of London Incorporated
268 Grosvenor Street
Box 5777
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (514) 646-6000 Ext. 64219
Fax: (519) 646-6116
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London , Ontario
N6A 5A5
London ON  N5V 1A1
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 33137
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58525
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paidrig Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Akhtar ( CPSO# 77344 )
Dr. P. Armstrong ( CPSO# 69648 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Services
Association of London Incorporated
268 Grosvenor Street
Box 5777 Stn B
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000


Corporation Name: Saima Akhtar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Akhtar ( CPSO# 77344 )
Dr. P. Armstrong ( CPSO# 69648 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, B Tower
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8002

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 26 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAIDRIG MICHAEL JOSEPH ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Sep 1995 to 20 Oct 1995
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2000