Arnold, Douglas John (CPSO#: 63206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Apr 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
119 Pine St South
Suite 326
Timmins ON  P4N 2K3
Phone: (705) 267-2373
Fax: (705) 267-1459
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Arnold Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Arnold ( CPSO# 63206 )

Business Address:
326 - 119 Pine Street South
Timmins ON  P4N 2K3
Phone Number: (705) 267-2373

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JOHN ARNOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNOLD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1991