Aronson, Ronnie (CPSO#: 62417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ronnie Aronson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Aronson ( CPSO# 62417 )

Business Address:
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 645-2929

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONNIE ARONSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARONSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1991