Arrazaghi, Abdelwahab Ahmed Alsed (CPSO#: 67643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
1920 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1H 2V6
Phone: (416) 438-8667
Fax: (416) 438-6358
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

28 Sandiford Drive
Richmond Hill ON  L4A7X5
Canada
Phone: 905-640-7100
Fax: 905-640-7161
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

4250 weston road
suite 100
Toronto ON  M9L 1W9
Canada
Phone: 416-740-3184
Fax: 416-740-3189
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

21589 Richmond Street, Arva,
London ON  N0M 1C0
Canada
Phone: 519-672-0070
Fax: 519-672-0070
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arrazaghi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Arrazaghi ( CPSO# 67643 )

Business Address:
207 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 438-8667

Business Address:
21589 Richmond Street
Arva ON  N0M 1C0

Business Address:
Suite 229A
5100 Erin Mills
Mississauga ON  L5M 4Z5

Business Address:
Toronto West Cardiac Centre
100 - 4250 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9L 1W9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDELWAHAB AHMED ALSED ARRAZAGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARRAZAGHI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 05 Feb 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Feb 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002