Arthur, Rebecca Hendrikje (CPSO#: 77868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Fertility
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z5
Phone: (416) 586-5266
Fax: (416) 348-9634
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R H Arthur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Arthur ( CPSO# 77868 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Centre for Fertility and Reproductive Health
Suite 700
250 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5266

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 21 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA HENDRIKJE ARTHUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARTHUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008