Arumugam, Bhavani R (CPSO#: 87597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malay, Tamil

Education:Sri Ramachandra Med Col\Research Instit, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Palermo Medical Centre
Suite 190
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (289) 837-0222
Fax: (289) 837-1222
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

45 Sheppard Ave East, Suite 301
Toronto ON  M2N5W9
Canada
Phone: 4169646253
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

9985 McVean Drive
Unit 4
Brampton ON  L6P4K8
Canada
Phone: 9057948844
Fax: 9057948833
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhavani Arumugam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Arumugam ( CPSO# 87597 )

Business Address:
Palermo Medical Centre
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 190
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (289) 837-0222

Business Address:
9985 McVean Drive
Suite 4
Brampton ON  L6P 0K4
Phone Number: (289) 837-0222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BHAVANI R ARUMUGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARUMUGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 24 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2009