Arwini, Ahmed A Salah (CPSO#: 76696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2141
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmed Arwini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Arwini ( CPSO# 76696 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED A SALAH ARWINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARWINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 17 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2008