Ashbourne, John Fraser (CPSO#: 31866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Emergency Room
One Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5022
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Haliburton Highland Health Services
6 McPherson Street
P O Box 30
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Canada
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Ashbourne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ashbourne ( CPSO# 31866 )
Dr. C. Brown ( CPSO# 30763 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5022

Business Address:
Emergency Department
6 McPherson Drive
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Phone Number: (705) 286-2288

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site Minden
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN FRASER ASHBOURNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHBOURNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2008