Ashe, Kassem Ali (CPSO#: 53888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's Regional Cardiac Care Ctr
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311 Ext. 6946
Fax: (519) 749-6677
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kassem Ashe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ashe ( CPSO# 53888 )

Business Address:
Suite 700
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KASSEM ALI ASHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1987