Ashton, Russell William (CPSO#: 66829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10B
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 740-5010
Fax: (519) 740-6010
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russell Ashton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ashton ( CPSO# 66829 )

Business Address:
Health Link Cambridge
B10 - 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 740-5010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUSSELL WILLIAM ASHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1995