Ateyah, Wameed (CPSO#: 81914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Schomberg Medical Centre
Unit 12A
17250 Highway 27
Schomberg ON  L0G 1T0
Phone: (905) 939-4600
Fax: (905) 939-4602
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wameed Ateyah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ateyah ( CPSO# 81914 )

Business Address:
Schomberg Medical Centre
Unit 12A
17250 Highway 27
Schomberg ON  L0G 1T0
Phone Number: (905) 939-4600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 May 2017

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Ateyah’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Ateyah engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or engaged in sexual abuse of a patient by making comments of a sexual and inappropriate nature towards a patient and by touching a patient in a sexual and inappropriate manner, during a medical appointment in October 2016. It is also alleged that Dr. Ateyah is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of a patient.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): May 14-18, 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 30, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Wameed Ateyah, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ateyah to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. WAMEED ATEYAH
                                          ("Dr. Ateyah")
                  
                                                to     
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A     PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Ateyah, certificate of registration number 81914, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, in the matter of College File Number 103797,
                  allegations that I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am
                  incompetent.  

            (4)   I, Dr. Ateyah, have read the Notice of Hearing dated April 19, 2017,
                  which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking
                  in lieu of making an Order under section 37 of the Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately, ("Effective Date").

            (8)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake that I shall not engage in any
                        professional, in person encounters, ("Professional Encounter(s)"),
                        with female patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the
                        Professional Encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who
                        is a female regulated health professional acceptable to the College
                        (the "Practice Monitor"), and unless the other requirements
                        provided in this Undertaking are fulfilled.  For further clarity, I
                        understand that I must not be alone with any female patient, for
                        any length of time, during any in person Professional Encounter,
                        whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also
                        present.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but
                        not limited to:
                  
                              1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice
                                    Monitor's undertaking) to the College on at least a
                                    monthly basis; 
                  
                              2.    remaining present at all times during all in person
                                    Professional Encounters with all female patients; 
                  
                              3.    carefully observing all of my in person Professional
                                    Encounters with female patients, including but not
                                    limited to physical and internal examinations.  I
                                    further acknowledge my obligation to ensure the
                                    Practice Monitor's view of all of my Professional
                                    Encounters with female patients, including physical and
                                    internal examinations, is unobstructed at all times; 
                  
                              4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except
                                    those required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                                    attached as Appendix "A",  while observing me in all my
                                    Professional Encounters with female patients; 
                  
                              5.    maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with
                                    female patients in the form attached to this
                                    Undertaking as Appendix "B" (the "Log");
                  
                              6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                                    patients noted in the Log or EMR using the Practice
                                    Monitor's own password and username; and
                  
                              7.    Submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                                    basis.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to maintain my own copy of the Log at all
                        times, and to make it available to the College upon request. 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.  

            (10)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post
                        a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting
                        rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, with the exception of
                        Southlake Regional Health Centre and the offices of the Dixon
                        Family Health Group,  in a clearly visible and secure location, in
                        the form set out in Appendix "C" that states: "Dr. Ateyah has
                        agreed not to have any  in person professional encounters, with
                        female patients of any age, unless in the presence of a female
                        practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr. Ateyah must not be alone during any in
                        person professional encounter with any female patient. Further
                        information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (10)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C.".
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (10)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (10)(b) prior to providing
                        services in the language(s) described in section (10)(d).
                  
                  
                  
            (11)  Notifying Patients

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to ensure that each patient scheduled for
                        an appointment with me is directly notified, prior to the
                        appointment, of the details of the restriction described in section
                        (8)(a). 
                  
                  (b)   If the appointment referred to in section (11)(a) above is
                        scheduled to take place more than seven (7) days after the date on
                        which it is booked, I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to ensure that each
                        patient scheduled for an appointment with me is directly notified,
                        within seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the
                        details of the restriction described in section (8)(a).
                  
            (12)  I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any chief(s) of staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,
                  at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Ateyah, warrant that I am not currently seeing any patients at the
                  offices of the Dixon Family Health Group.  I undertake to provide fifteen
                  (15) days' notice to the College if I intend to resume seeing patients at
                  the Dixon Family Health Group  in which case the terms of the undertaking
                  will apply to patient encounters at that location.

            (15)  I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (16)  I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel
                  in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to
                  do so.

            (17)  In the event of an appeal of any order of the Discipline Committee, I,
                  Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (18)  I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (20)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Ateyah is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                              Committee into allegations of professional misconduct and/or
                              incompetence.  As a result of the referral:
                  
                              Dr. Ateyah has agreed not to have in person professional
                              encounters,  with female patients of any age, in any
                              jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the
                              presence of a monitor who is a female regulated health
                              professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other
                              requirements provided in Dr. Ateyah's Undertaking with the
                              College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Ateyah must
                              not be alone with any female patient during any in person
                              professional encounter.
                  
                              Dr. Ateyah shall post a sign in all waiting rooms,
                              examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice
                              Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that
                              states: "Dr. Ateyah has agreed not to have in person
                              professional encounters, with female patients of any age,
                              unless in the presence of a female practice monitor
                              acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                              Ontario.  Dr. Ateyah must not be alone with any female
                              patient during any in person professional encounter. Further
                              information may be found on the College website at
                              www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (21)  I, Dr. Ateyah, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (23)  I, Dr. Ateyah, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records by the College
                  and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (24)  I, Dr. Ateyah, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Practice Monitors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (25)  I, Dr. Ateyah, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (26)  I, Dr. Ateyah, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: May 30, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Wameed Ateyah to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 30, 2017:

Dr. Ateyah is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Ateyah has agreed not to have in person professional encounters, with female patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a female regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Ateyah’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Ateyah must not be alone with any female patient during any in person professional encounter.

Dr. Ateyah shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Ateyah has agreed not to have in person professional encounters, with female patients of any age, unless in the presence of a female practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Ateyah must not be alone with any female patient during any in person professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.