Athale, Uma Harish (CPSO#: 76925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Jul 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children't Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1280 Main Street West HSC 3N27
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73431
Fax: (905) 521-1703
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Uma Athale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Athale ( CPSO# 76925 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Jul 2006
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Jul 2006

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2006 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Uma H. Athale may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Paediatrics, McMaster University, in which Dr. Athale
                        holds a geographical  full-time teaching or research appointment at
                        the rank of Associate Professor, and;
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required  by the teaching or research requirements of
                        her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically expire when Dr. Athale no longer holds
                  the appointment in clause 1.