Atherton, William (CPSO#: 29782)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atherton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 11 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Feb 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2014