Athreya, Sriharsha (CPSO#: 88609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Jun 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Room T0112
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 9055221155
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. S. Athreya ( CPSO# 88609 )
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G1 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300


Corporation Name: Athreya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Athreya ( CPSO# 88609 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care Hamilton
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Jun 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Sriharsha  Athreya  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  Diagnostic
            Radiology.