Atkinson, Celia (CPSO#: 81121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272 Ext. 6616
Fax: (416) 469-6591
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Clinical and Metabolic
Genetics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-7500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Celia Atkinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Atkinson ( CPSO# 81121 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
The Hospital of Sick Children
Division of Clinical & Metabolic Genetics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 600-2133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CELIA ATKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATKINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2007 to 16 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2008