Attuah, Kwame (CPSO#: 33692)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Dec 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Attuah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2010
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Jul 2013
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 02 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Dec 2014

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Jan 2015
Summary:

 On January 21, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kwame Attuah committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional. Dr. Attuah admitted the allegation.

On November 
 12, 2012, Dr. Attuah entered into an undertaking (the “Undertaking”). Pursuant to the Undertaking, 
 Dr. Attuah undertook to practice under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor, who was acceptable 
 to the College, and to provide a signed undertaking of an approved Clinical Supervisor to the 
 College by December 12, 2012 in order to continue to practice medicine in Ontario.

As of December 
 12, 2012, Dr. Attuah had not obtained a Clinical Supervisor. Accordingly, as of December 13, 2012, 
 he was required to cease practicing medicine in Ontario.  Instead, Dr. Attuah treated 57 patients 
 over 33 days in February and March 2013 without being under clinical supervision, including 
 writing prescriptions for patients. Therefore, this constituted a breach of his Undertaking with 
 the College.

On December 19, 2014, Dr. Attuah signed an undertaking to resign from the College 
 effective immediately and never re-apply to practise medicine in Ontario or any other Canadian 
 jurisdiction.

The Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. Attuah attend before the panel to 
 be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2. Dr. Attuah shall 
 within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $4,460.00.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 21, 2015


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 Jul 2013
Summary:

On July 4, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kwame Attuah committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional. Dr. Attuah admitted the allegation. 
 
Dr. Attuah is trained in obstetrics and gynaecology. On January 14, 2010, Dr. Attuah entered into 
an undertaking with the College which included specific requirements to limit his practice to a 
walk-in clinic, to work no more than 40 hours a week, to limit his practice to obstetrics and 
gynaecology and to practice under the supervision of a clinical supervisor. 
 
On March 9, 2010, allegations that Dr. Attuah was incapacitated were referred to the Fitness to 
Practice Committee. On May 17, 2010, a section 62 Order was issued which required that Dr. 
Attuah's practice be limited to a walk-in clinic in the areas of obstetrics and gynaecology, that he 
see no more than 75 patients per week and that he practice under the supervision of a monitor. 
On September 28, 2010, a section 62 Order was issued, which included the continuation of the 
above restrictions, as well as the requirement for the monitor to observe Dr. Attuah's practice 
monthly, for a minimum of half a day. 
 
An analysis of Dr. Attuah's OHIP billings illustrates that Dr. Attuah frequently and repeatedly 
breached the terms of his January 2010 undertaking and s.62 orders between January 2010 and 
September 2010 as well as in December of 2010 by seeing more than 75 patients a week and by 
treating male and child patients. Dr. Attuah breached terms of the September 28, 2010 Order 
through signing a letter for a male patient, Patient A.  The letter signed was in support of Patient 
A, who was seeking an adjournment of a hearing on the basis of medical reasons. In signing this 
letter, Dr. Attuah failed to limit his practice to obstetrics and gynaecology. 
 
On May 2, 2012, an Order under section 62 was issued which included the continuation of the 
previous section 62 restrictions, as well as the requirement that the monitor observe a minimum 
of ten percent of the patients Dr. Attuah treated per month. By way of letter dated May 11, 2012, 
Dr. Attuah was notified by the College that he had to cease practising as he was without a 
monitor as required under the May 2, 2012 Order. Dr. Attuah breached terms of the May 2, 2012 
Order through signing a further letter dated May 31, 2012 with respect to Patient A.  
 
On November 22, 2012, the College withdrew the allegation of incapacity pending before the 
Fitness to Practise Committee after Dr. Attuah entered into an undertaking that addressed the 
College's incapacity concerns. 
 
The Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      Dr. Attuah appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
      the Registrar suspend Dr. Attuah's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) 
      months commencing at 12:01 a.m. on July 5, 2013. 
 
      Dr. Attuah pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00 within six (6) months of 
the date of this Order.  
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 4, 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 19, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:


UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. KWAME ATTUAH
(“Dr. Attuah”)

to

THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)


A. PREAMBLE

(1) I, Dr. Attuah, certificate of registration number 33692, was a member of the
College.

(2) I, Dr. Attuah, acknowledge and agree that the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports
Committee of the College referred allegations of professional misconduct to the
Discipline Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated September 4, 2013 (the “Notice of
Hearing”), and that I admit the allegations in the Notice of Hearing.

(3) I, Dr. Attuah, acknowledge and agree that I was also the subject of investigations
by the College (the “Investigations”).

(4) I, Dr. Attuah, acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline
Committee of the College in respect of the Investigations.

B. UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT

(5) I, Dr. Attuah, hereby resign from the College effective immediately (the
“Effective Date”).

(6) I, Dr. Attuah, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a
physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other Canadian jurisdiction after the
Effective Date.

2

(7) I, Dr. Attuah, agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I
am in breach of this Undertaking including, but not limited to, becoming aware that I
have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a
physician or for a certificate of registration, or equivalent, to practise medicine in any
Canadian jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall, in its sole discretion,
have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this
Undertaking and shall have the right to proceed with the Investigations it terminated as a
result of this Undertaking and/or to proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the
Discipline Committee.

(8) I, Dr. Attuah, hereby agree to bear the risk of any prejudice that the passage of
time might cause to my ability to make full answer and defence, and waive the right to
seek any remedy on the basis of the passage of time, should the College proceed with any
allegations that may arise as a result of a breach of this Undertaking and/or pursuant to
paragraph (7) above.

(9) I, Dr. Attuah, undertake to the College to abide by the terms of the College’s
Policy on Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise,
Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of
which is attached hereto as Appendix A.

(10) I, Dr. Attuah, undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall
forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”)
that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the Effective Date.

(11) I, Dr. Attuah, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all
fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc., if any, arising from the implementation of any of the
terms of this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Attuah, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(13) I, Dr. Attuah, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate
enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information, in
order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.




3

(14) I, Dr. Attuah, consent to this Undertaking being entered on the public register as
information that is available to the public.