Attwood, David George (CPSO#: 68259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Hospital
Schizophrenia Program
3rd Floor
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 7020
Fax: (613) 798-2971
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David G. Attwood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Attwood ( CPSO# 68259 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
Schizophrenia Program
3rd Floor
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GEORGE ATTWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTWOOD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2011