Atwal, Rajinder Kaur (CPSO#: 68391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: Nagra, Rajinder Kaur (used until: 28 Nov 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bathurst Walk-In Clinic
and Family Practice
Suite 101
4430 Bathurst Street
North York ON  M3H 3S3
Phone: (416) 633-3629
Fax: (416) 633-3624
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Atwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Atwal ( CPSO# 68391 )

Business Address:
Bathurst Walk-In Clinic
and Family Practice
Suite 101
4430 Bathurst Street
Downsview ON  M3H 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 633-3629

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJINDER KAUR ATWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1996